This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/26/2022 at 18:05:45 (UTC).

ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC V GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/25/2022 ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRYSON , MARNI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRYSON , MARNI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC

Defendant and Respondent

GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SALK , KENNETH B

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MONTGOMERY , CANDICE

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/25/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/25/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4325065

01/26/2022:PAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4325065

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/26/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/14/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

02/18/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • HearingSCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location:SB; Room:ZOOM PIP Pre-Trial (South Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:& DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS F/B CANDICE MONTGOMERY OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SUBSTITUTE GE1CO CASUALTY COMPANY - 02/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4325065; Receipt Amount: $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$90.00; total Amount Paid:$90.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:01/26/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:01/26/2022; Description:402FF County Civil Claim > $100 < $500; Amount Due:$80.00; Amount Paid:$80.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:PLEADINGS@SALKLAWFIRM.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 3/8/2022 9:30 AM BRYSON, MARNI; Notes:SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 3/8/2022 9:30 AM BRYSON, MARNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $90.00 ON RECEIPT 4325065; Notes:$90.00 4325065 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RS: South Branch County Civil Division - RS (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:FOR DAMAGES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACORN WELLNESS CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALK ESQ, KENNETH B