This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 09/03/2022 at 19:14:35 (UTC).

ACN BAROMEDICAL LLC A/A/O NADEGE MOISE V PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 ACN BAROMEDICAL LLC A/A/O NADEGE MOISE filed an Other lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ACN BAROMEDICAL LLC A/A/O NADEGE MOISE

Respondent and Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY E

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

BROCK , REBECCA L

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/25/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/25/2022:COMPLAINT

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED A CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THIS SUMMONS OR FILED IN THE SAME FILING PER A.O. 3.107 PAGES 10 & 11.THANK YOU

07/25/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED A CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THIS SUMMONS OR FILED IN THE SAME FILING PER A.O. 3.107 PAGES 10 & 11.THANK YOU

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4549134

07/26/2022:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4549134

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

07/28/2022:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4555401

07/29/2022:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4555401

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

08/26/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/29/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: F/B REBECCA L BROCK OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4555401; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $320.00; total Amount Paid: $320.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/29/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4555401; Notes: $10.00 4555401 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efilings@pip-lawyers.com;efilings@pip-lawyers.com E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4549134; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/26/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/26/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4549134; Notes: $310.00 4549134 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED A CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THIS SUMMONS OR FILED IN THE SAME FILING PER A.O. 3.107 PAGES 10 & 11.THANK YOU; Notes: EFILINGS@PIP-LAWYERS.COM A CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THIS SUMMONS OR FILED IN THE SAME FILING PER A.O. 3.107 PAGES 10 & 11.THANK YOU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACN BAROMEDICAL, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.