This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 07/19/2019 at 22:46:57 (UTC).

ABEL, DAVID V JPMORGAN CHASE & CO

Case Summary

On 10/13/2015 ABEL, DAVID filed an Other lawsuit against JPMORGAN CHASE CO. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL , LISA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMALL , LISA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

JABA ASSOCIATES LP

93 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GIULIANO ESQ, NICOLE W

Other Attorneys

DIPRIMA , STEPHEN R

CHAITMAN ESQ, HELEN DAVIS

STEARNS ESQ, EUGENE E

KLEINHAUS , EMIL A

DANNER , SCOTT M

YAVITZ , NOAH B

 

Court Documents

MANDATE

06/14/2019:MANDATE

TRUE COPY

02/20/2019:TRUE COPY

TRUE COPY

11/05/2018:TRUE COPY

TRUE COPY

11/05/2018:TRUE COPY

AUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING

10/01/2018:AUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING

PAID $209.50 ON RECEIPT 2861920

10/01/2018:PAID $209.50 ON RECEIPT 2861920

INVOICE

09/27/2018:INVOICE

INDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL

09/27/2018:INDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL

TRUE COPY

09/21/2018:TRUE COPY

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE

08/16/2018:ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE

TRUE COPY

08/16/2018:TRUE COPY

AUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING

08/16/2018:AUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING

AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL BOOK 30063 PAGE 1704-1726

08/15/2018:AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL BOOK 30063 PAGE 1704-1726

MEMORANDUM

08/15/2018:MEMORANDUM

PAID $100.00 ON RECEIPT 2800478

08/15/2018:PAID $100.00 ON RECEIPT 2800478

NOTICE OF APPEAL CIVIL

08/15/2018:NOTICE OF APPEAL CIVIL

ORDER SMALL - ON DFTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - DISMISS GRANTED. DISMISSAL IS W/PREJUDICE. DFTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - GRANTED. DTD 7/20/18 BOOK 30008 PAGE 1772-1792

07/20/2018:ORDER SMALL - ON DFTS MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - DISMISS GRANTED. DISMISSAL IS W/PREJUDICE. DFTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - GRANTED. DTD 7/20/18 BOOK 30008 PAGE 1772-1792

NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY F/B DFTS

01/25/2018:NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY F/B DFTS

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE; Notes:AFFIRMED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRUE COPY; Notes:ORDER 4TH DCA APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF IS STRICKEN AS NOT IN COMPLIANCE 10 DAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRUE COPY; Notes:ORDER 4TH DCA NOAH B. YAVITZ, ESQ.'S MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRUE COPY; Notes:ORDER 4TH DCA EMIL A KLEINHAUS, ESQ.'S MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING; Notes:RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $209.50 ON RECEIPT 2861920; Notes:$209.50 2861920 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINVOICE; Notes:18-2442 209.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL; Notes:18-2442

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRUE COPY; Notes:ORDER 4TH DCA CHAITMAN,ESQ TO APPEAL PRO HAC VICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE; Notes:18-2442

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketDue Date:08/15/2018; Description:801FF Appeal from Circuit to 4DCA_070117; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • DocketDue Date:05/09/2017; Description:8PRV Circuit Court Attorney Appearing PRO HAC VICE; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • DocketDue Date:02/03/2016; Description:8PRV Circuit Court Attorney Appearing PRO HAC VICE; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • DocketDue Date:02/03/2016; Description:8PRV Circuit Court Attorney Appearing PRO HAC VICE; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • DocketDue Date:02/03/2016; Description:8PRV Circuit Court Attorney Appearing PRO HAC VICE; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • DocketDue Date:02/03/2016; Description:8PRV Circuit Court Attorney Appearing PRO HAC VICE; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketDue Date:11/13/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$40.00; Amount Paid:$40.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • DocketDue Date:10/27/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$100.00; Amount Paid:$100.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • DocketDue Date:10/19/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$2.50; Amount Paid:$2.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • DocketDue Date:10/19/2015; Description:Civil Conversion Fee PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less