This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/15/2022 at 19:30:27 (UTC).

911 RESTORATION, INC. V HOSSAIN, ROMANA

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 911 RESTORATION, INC filed an Other lawsuit against HOSSAIN, ROMANA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

911 RESTORATION, INC.

Defendants and Respondents

BATEN , MOHAMED

HOSSAIN , ROMANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KLIGLER , JOSHUA C

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LAVIN , ROSS G

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/06/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/06/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/06/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

LIS PENDENS

05/06/2022:LIS PENDENS

PAID $325.60 ON RECEIPT 4456543

05/09/2022:PAID $325.60 ON RECEIPT 4456543

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/12/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

05/12/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

05/25/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

05/25/2022:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO FILE RESPONSE- JUDGE GARRISON DTD 6/7/22

06/07/2022:ORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO FILE RESPONSE- JUDGE GARRISON DTD 6/7/22

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING DFTS TO FILE RESPONSE- JUDGE GARRISON DTD 6/7/22; Notes: DIRECTING DFTS TO FILE RESPONSE- JUDGE GARRISON DTD 6/7/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: TO ANSWER (WRONG DFT) FB PLTS ATTY ROSS G LAVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS OBO DFTS HOSSAIN & BATEN. FB ATTY ROSS G LAVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE ROMANA HOSSAIN - 05/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE MOHAMED BATEN - 05/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4456543; Receipt Amount: $325.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $325.60; total Amount Paid: $325.60; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/09/2022; Description: Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due: $5.60; Amount Paid: $5.60; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/09/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/09/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/09/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $325.60 ON RECEIPT 4456543; Notes: $325.60 4456543 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 33549 PAGE 1892-1892; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: joshua.kligler@dunnlawpa.com;paula.martinez@dunnlawpa.com;collections@dunnlawpa.com MOHAMED BATEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: joshua.kligler@dunnlawpa.com;paula.martinez@dunnlawpa.com;collections@dunnlawpa.com ROMANA HOSSAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 911 Restoration Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLIGLER , JOSHUA C