This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/12/2021 at 23:22:28 (UTC).

456 WA LLC V USIC LLC

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 456 WA LLC filed an Other lawsuit against USIC LLC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KASTRENAKES , JOHN S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KASTRENAKES , JOHN S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

456 WA LLC

Respondent and Defendant

USIC LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MONCHICK , MICHAEL J

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

JOFFE , JASON D

KUBICZ , P JAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/09/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/09/2020:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/09/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

10/09/2020:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3776739

10/13/2020:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3776739

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/20/2020:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

11/06/2020:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

11/06/2020:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

ORDER J KASTRENAKES DTD. 11/10/20 GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND

11/10/2020:ORDER J KASTRENAKES DTD. 11/10/20 GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/25/2020:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

11/30/2020:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/01/2020:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AGREED ORDER JKASTRENAKES DTD 12/1/20 GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORIES SERVED WITH THE COMPLAINT -GRANTED

12/01/2020:AGREED ORDER JKASTRENAKES DTD 12/1/20 GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORIES SERVED WITH THE COMPLAINT -GRANTED

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

12/02/2020:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER JKASTRENAKES DTD 12/1/20 GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORIES SERVED WITH THE COMPLAINT -GRANTED; Notes:JKASTRENAKES DTD 12/1/20 GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORIES SERVED WITH THE COMPLAINT -GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORIES SERVED WITH THE COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:DEFENDANT USIC LLC ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. F/B DFTS ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER J KASTRENAKES DTD. 11/10/20 GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND; Notes:J KASTRENAKES DTD. 11/10/20 GRANTING AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:AGREED TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FILED BY ATTY KUBICZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED USIC, LLC - 10/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3776739; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/13/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:10/13/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3776739; Notes:$411.00 3776739 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AF: Circuit Civil Central - AF (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:mmonchick@siegfriedrivera.com;mrose@siegfriedrivera.com;docketing@siegfriedrivera.com AS TO USIC LLC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MONCHICK , MICHAEL J