This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 08/29/2022 at 15:29:00 (UTC).

360 TOTAL MANAGEMENT V PRINCILUS, CARLINE

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 360 TOTAL MANAGEMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PRINCILUS, CARLINE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

360 TOTAL MANAGEMENT

Defendant and Respondent

PRINCILUS , CARLINE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/29/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4555124

07/29/2022:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4555124

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

07/29/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/29/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

07/29/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

08/02/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

08/04/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

REQUEST

08/15/2022:REQUEST

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

08/15/2022:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $19.00 ON RECEIPT 4574947

08/15/2022:PAID $19.00 ON RECEIPT 4574947

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/24/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: AS TO CARLINE PRINCILUS SERVED ON 08/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4574947; Receipt Amount: $19.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $214.00; total Amount Paid: $214.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/15/2022; Description: CC County Civil Service Charges PB 01262020; Amount Due: $9.00; Amount Paid: $9.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 08/15/2022; Description: Summons $10.00; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $19.00 ON RECEIPT 4574947; Notes: $19.00 4574947 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST; Notes: FOR ALIAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: AS TO PRINCILUS CARLINE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4555124; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/29/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/29/2022; Description: Summons $10.00; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4555124; Notes: $195.00 4555124 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less