This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 08/29/2022 at 19:14:19 (UTC).

22 AVENUE CORPORATION V TRIPLETT, KEITH E

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 22 AVENUE CORPORATION filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TRIPLETT, KEITH E. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

22 AVENUE CORPORATION

Defendants and Respondents

TRIPLETT , KATHY L

TRIPLETT , KEITH E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

KASS ESQ, MARK EVANS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/20/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

07/20/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4544509

07/21/2022:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4544509

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/21/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/21/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4546591

07/22/2022:PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4546591

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/08/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/08/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

08/15/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

08/15/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

08/17/2022:CLERK'S DEFAULT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

08/17/2022:CLERK'S DEFAULT

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 33796 PAGE 1248-1248

08/22/2022:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 33796 PAGE 1248-1248

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes: DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 33796 PAGE 1248-1248; Notes: FOR REMOVAL OF TENANT - JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 8/22/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: KEITH E TRIPLETT AND KATHY L TRIPLETT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: BY CLERK AGAINST KEITH E TRIPLETT AND KATHY L TRIPLETT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED KEITH E. TRIPLETT - 08/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED KATHY L. TRIPLETT - 08/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4546591; Receipt Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $205.00; total Amount Paid: $205.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/22/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4546591; Notes: $20.00 4546591 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4544509; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/21/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mekpa60@gmail.com;mekpa@aol.com;adk.mekpa60@gmail.com KATHY L TRIPLETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: mekpa60@gmail.com;mekpa@aol.com;adk.mekpa60@gmail.com KEITH E TRIPLETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4544509; Notes: $185.00 4544509 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 22 AVENUE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kass, Mark E.