This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/23/2021 at 23:11:39 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ZHAO, LING YAN

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ZHAO, LING YAN. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III and JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2856

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ZHAO, LING YAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

1/8/2021: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

NO INFORMATION

1/7/2021: NO INFORMATION

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT

12/17/2020: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT

DECLINATION OF PROSECUTION

12/11/2020: DECLINATION OF PROSECUTION

PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2020096182

12/8/2020: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2020096182

NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

11/30/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

SURETY BOND AS1K-529896 POSTED $500.00

11/25/2020: SURETY BOND AS1K-529896 POSTED $500.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: BATTERY SIMPLE -CAUSE BODILY HARM (784.03 1A2); Degree: F; Level: M; Disposition: NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: 2 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DECLINATION OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2020096182

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • HearingEvent: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2020
  • HearingEvent: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III; Location: HEARING ROOM 6D; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/18/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/03/2020 AT 8:05 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 11/24/2020 AT 1:00 PM IN 6D BEFORE JUDGE: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 002856

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less