This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/27/2023 at 23:14:30 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. TUMEY, SHAWNA LEIGH

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TUMEY, SHAWNA LEIGH. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WILSON, TANYA DAVIS and YOUNG, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3406

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WILSON, TANYA DAVIS

YOUNG, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

TUMEY, SHAWNA LEIGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SHIELDS, MATTHEW BROCK

 

Court Documents

CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

11/28/2022: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

11/28/2022: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

12/21/2022: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER WITHDRAWAL

12/22/2022: ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER WITHDRAWAL

BOND (COPY SURETY)

1/17/2023: BOND (COPY SURETY)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES REQUEST FOR TEN DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS; MATTHEW BROCK SHIELDS

1/18/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES REQUEST FOR TEN DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS; MATTHEW BROCK SHIELDS

NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

1/18/2023: NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF IMPEACHING INFORMATION AND EVIDENCE FAVORABLE TO DEFENDANT

1/18/2023: MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF IMPEACHING INFORMATION AND EVIDENCE FAVORABLE TO DEFENDANT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF IMPEACHING INFORMATION AND EVIDENCE FAVORABLE TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES REQUEST FOR TEN DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS; MATTHEW BROCK SHIELDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: BOND (COPY SURETY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND 562776169-6 POSTED $1,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ALLOWING PUBLIC DEFENDER WITHDRAWAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: WEEKEND INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 11/27/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN WE BEFORE JUDGE: YOUNG, TOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/28/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CF 003406

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2022
  • HearingEvent: WEEKEND INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: YOUNG, TOM; Location: WEEKEND IA'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIELDS, MATTHEW BROCK