This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/23/2020 at 20:03:20 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. THOMPSON, WILLIS GERRARD

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against THOMPSON, WILLIS GERRARD. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E and JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2864

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

THOMPSON, WILLIS GERRARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

12/1/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

SURETY BOND U5-20949122 POSTED $1,000.00

11/30/2020: SURETY BOND U5-20949122 POSTED $1,000.00

FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

11/25/2020: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

11/25/2020: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

11/25/2020: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION NOT FILED YET, RESET FOR ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/05/2021 AT 8:45 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: 2 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • HearingEvent: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND U5-20949122 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • HearingEvent: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E; Location: HEARING ROOM 6D; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/18/2020 AT 2:00 PM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/03/2020 AT 8:05 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 11/25/2020 AT 1:00 PM IN 6D BEFORE JUDGE: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 002864

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less