This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 17:55:05 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. THOMPSON, JAVONTE

Case Summary

On 02/19/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against THOMPSON, JAVONTE. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0709

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

THOMPSON, JAVONTE

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $21.43 RECEIPT #2019071710

7/23/2019: PAYMENT $21.43 RECEIPT #2019071710

PAYMENT $17.86 RECEIPT #2019066759

7/8/2019: PAYMENT $17.86 RECEIPT #2019066759

COLLECTION SECOND NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

7/3/2019: COLLECTION SECOND NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

PAYMENT $21.43 RECEIPT #2019047865

5/13/2019: PAYMENT $21.43 RECEIPT #2019047865

COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

10/5/2018: COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

PAYMENT $35.00 RECEIPT #2018094715

10/1/2018: PAYMENT $35.00 RECEIPT #2018094715

PAYMENT $40.00 RECEIPT #2018080872

8/20/2018: PAYMENT $40.00 RECEIPT #2018080872

COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

8/2/2018: COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

PAYMENT $40.00 RECEIPT #2018062121

6/26/2018: PAYMENT $40.00 RECEIPT #2018062121

PAYMENT $30.00 RECEIPT #2018043067

5/1/2018: PAYMENT $30.00 RECEIPT #2018043067

CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

4/13/2018: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT

4/3/2018: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT

COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT SCHEDULE

4/3/2018: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT SCHEDULE

WAIVER OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL, FILED IN OPEN CT

4/3/2018: WAIVER OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL, FILED IN OPEN CT

PLEA AGREEMENT

4/3/2018: PLEA AGREEMENT

INFORMATION FILED

3/16/2018: INFORMATION FILED

SURETY BOND AA18-478718 POSTED $500.00

2/19/2018: SURETY BOND AA18-478718 POSTED $500.00

CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED $250 ORIGINAL BOND AMOUNT CT 1 $500 ORIGINAL BOND AMOUNT CT 2 ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

2/19/2018: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED $250 ORIGINAL BOND AMOUNT CT 1 $500 ORIGINAL BOND AMOUNT CT 2 ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $21.43 RECEIPT #2019071710

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $17.86 RECEIPT #2019066759

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketEntry: RTCP WAIVED $7.14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COLLECTION SECOND NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketEntry: MAIL RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $21.43 RECEIPT #2019047865

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketEntry: RTCP WAIVED $8.57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $35.71 RECEIPT #2019033283

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • DocketEntry: RTCP WAIVED $14.29

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT RESET INFORMATION NOT FILED YET, RESET FOR ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 04/03/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 03/15/2018 AT 8:10 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND AA18-478718 POSTED $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND AA18-478717 POSTED $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED $250 ORIGINAL BOND AMOUNT CT 1 $500 ORIGINAL BOND AMOUNT CT 2 ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/19/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 MM 000709

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant