This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/10/2020 at 22:38:56 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. STRAUGHTER, SAMMY LEE IV

Case Summary

On 12/22/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against STRAUGHTER, SAMMY LEE IV. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OBRIEN, HEATHER K, CALDERON, LUIS F and JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3907

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OBRIEN, HEATHER K

CALDERON, LUIS F

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

STRAUGHTER, SAMMY LEE IV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KAGAN, TRACEY GAIL

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $379.00 RECEIPT #2018044481

5/4/2018: PAYMENT $379.00 RECEIPT #2018044481

PAYMENT $59.00 RECEIPT #2018038900

4/19/2018: PAYMENT $59.00 RECEIPT #2018038900

CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

3/29/2018: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT SCHEDULE

3/15/2018: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT SCHEDULE

COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE OFFICE APPLICATION

3/15/2018: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE OFFICE APPLICATION

COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT

3/15/2018: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT

PLEA AGREEMENT

3/15/2018: PLEA AGREEMENT

NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

1/29/2018: NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

INFORMATION FILED

1/17/2018: INFORMATION FILED

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND FOR ORDER OF PAYMENT OF STATUTORY FEE, COPY TO JUDGE

1/8/2018: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AND FOR ORDER OF PAYMENT OF STATUTORY FEE, COPY TO JUDGE

PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 02/28/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

1/2/2018: PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 02/28/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

1/2/2018: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

1/2/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

12/28/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

SURETY BOND 2017-CC-016919 POSTED $500.00

12/28/2017: SURETY BOND 2017-CC-016919 POSTED $500.00

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $379.00 RECEIPT #2018044481

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $59.00 RECEIPT #2018038900

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: RECORDED DOCUMENT RETURNED FROM RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: RECORDED DOCUMENT RETURNED FROM RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • HearingEvent: PLEA DATE CERTAIN; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: POSSESSION MARIJUANA UNDER 20 GRAMS (893.13 6B); Degree: F; Level: M; Disposition: ADJ WITHHELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketEntry: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 12/22/2017 AT 1:30 PM IN 6D BEFORE JUDGE: CALDERON, LUIS F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/04/2018 AT 8:05 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: OBRIEN, HEATHER K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/29/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/22/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 MM 003907

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less