This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 16:57:22 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SOTO, FERNANDO

Case Summary

On 11/05/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SOTO, FERNANDO. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E, DRAPER, CAROL E and JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3761

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

DRAPER, CAROL E

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SOTO, FERNANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

IVANOR, CARLOS A. JR

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $37.00 RECEIPT #2019107265

11/4/2019: PAYMENT $37.00 RECEIPT #2019107265

PAYMENT $37.00 RECEIPT #2019098892

10/10/2019: PAYMENT $37.00 RECEIPT #2019098892

PAYMENT $35.00 RECEIPT #2019077609

8/7/2019: PAYMENT $35.00 RECEIPT #2019077609

PAYMENT $37.00 RECEIPT #2019055040

6/4/2019: PAYMENT $37.00 RECEIPT #2019055040

PAYMENT $37.00 RECEIPT #2019033319

4/2/2019: PAYMENT $37.00 RECEIPT #2019033319

CERTIFICATE OF COSTS IMPOSED

2/19/2019: CERTIFICATE OF COSTS IMPOSED

COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE OFFICE APPLICATION

1/24/2019: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE OFFICE APPLICATION

STATE'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE AND STATE'S NOTICE OF FILING

1/18/2019: STATE'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE AND STATE'S NOTICE OF FILING

NOTICE OF JUDICIAL NOTICE REQUEST

1/18/2019: NOTICE OF JUDICIAL NOTICE REQUEST

* DEMAND FOR SPEEDY TRIAL DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ATTORNEY NOT PRESENT * REMAINS SET FOR BOND HEARING AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

1/14/2019: * DEMAND FOR SPEEDY TRIAL DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ATTORNEY NOT PRESENT * REMAINS SET FOR BOND HEARING AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 01/24/2019 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

1/10/2019: PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 01/24/2019 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

ORDER ON DEFENSE MOTION TO QUASH CAPIAS, REINSTATE BOND, AND SET ASIDE BOND ESTREATURE DENIED BY JUDGE

1/10/2019: ORDER ON DEFENSE MOTION TO QUASH CAPIAS, REINSTATE BOND, AND SET ASIDE BOND ESTREATURE DENIED BY JUDGE

NOTICE OF HEARING

1/8/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

RESPONSE FROM JUDGE

12/14/2018: RESPONSE FROM JUDGE

TRANSPORT ORDER

12/14/2018: TRANSPORT ORDER

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION

12/12/2018: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION

TRANSPORT ORDER

11/30/2018: TRANSPORT ORDER

SURETY BOND 562273028-4 POSTED $500.00

11/5/2018: SURETY BOND 562273028-4 POSTED $500.00

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $37.00 RECEIPT #2020001667

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $34.00 RECEIPT #2019119281

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $37.00 RECEIPT #2019107265

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $37.00 RECEIPT #2019098892

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $35.00 RECEIPT #2019077609

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $37.00 RECEIPT #2019066527

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $37.00 RECEIPT #2019055040

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $37.00 RECEIPT #2019045049

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $37.00 RECEIPT #2019033319

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $35.00 RECEIPT #2019021764

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 11/30/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND 562273028-4 POSTED $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND 562273029-7 POSTED $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED $250 ORIGINAL BOND AMOUNT CT 1 $500 ORIGINAL BOND AMOUNT CT 2 ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/05/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 MM 003761

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less