This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/27/2023 at 23:14:45 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SANTIAGO ROBLES, JOEL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SANTIAGO ROBLES, JOEL. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CARSTEN, KEITH and YOUNG, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3405

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CARSTEN, KEITH

YOUNG, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SANTIAGO ROBLES, JOEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF INVOCATION OF CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS

11/28/2022: NOTICE OF INVOCATION OF CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS

CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

11/28/2022: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

BOND (COPY SURETY)

12/19/2022: BOND (COPY SURETY)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: BOND (COPY SURETY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND AA22-791892 POSTED $1,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND AA22-791894 POSTED $5,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR REDUCTION OF BAIL BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF INVOCATION OF CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: WEEKEND INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 11/27/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN WE BEFORE JUDGE: YOUNG, TOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/28/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CF 003405

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2022
  • HearingEvent: WEEKEND INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: YOUNG, TOM; Location: WEEKEND IA'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant