This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/05/2022 at 23:08:53 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. SANCHEZ-RIVERA, DARIEN

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SANCHEZ-RIVERA, DARIEN. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CARSTEN, KEITH and DUBOIS, ERIC H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1631

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CARSTEN, KEITH

DUBOIS, ERIC H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SANCHEZ-RIVERA, DARIEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MELENDEZ, CARLOS J

 

Court Documents

CASH APPEARANCE BONDS

6/7/2022: CASH APPEARANCE BONDS

CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

6/6/2022: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

6/6/2022: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT WRITEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPY OF INDICTMENT OR INFORMATION REQUEST FOR TEN DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS

6/6/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT WRITEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPY OF INDICTMENT OR INFORMATION REQUEST FOR TEN DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS

NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

7/1/2022: NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

NO INFORMATION

7/11/2022: NO INFORMATION

SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT FROM SHERIFF'S OFFICE

7/19/2022: SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT FROM SHERIFF'S OFFICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT FROM SHERIFF'S OFFICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (784.03 1A1); Degree: F; Level: M; Disposition: NO INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • ChargeCount: 2; Description: KIDNAP FALSE IMPRISONMENT-ADULT (787.02 1A); Degree: T; Level: F; Disposition: NO INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NO INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASH BOND 07001392A POSTED $2,500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASH BOND 07001391A POSTED $1,500.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CASH APPEARANCE BONDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT WRITEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPY OF INDICTMENT OR INFORMATION REQUEST FOR TEN DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: WRITTEN WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL RELEASE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: WEEKEND INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 06/04/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN WE BEFORE JUDGE: DUBOIS, ERIC H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/06/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CF 001631

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2022
  • HearingEvent: WEEKEND INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: DUBOIS, ERIC H; Location: WEEKEND IA'S; Result: EVENT HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MELENDEZ, CARLOS J