This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 12/29/2021 at 20:04:47 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ROSARIO, CHRIS

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROSARIO, CHRIS. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CARSTEN, KEITH and YOUNG, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3477

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CARSTEN, KEITH

YOUNG, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ROSARIO, CHRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT FROM SHERIFF'S OFFICE

12/2/2021: SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT FROM SHERIFF'S OFFICE

BOND (COPY SURETY)

12/2/2021: BOND (COPY SURETY)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND AS6K805308 POSTED $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: BOND (COPY SURETY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT FROM SHERIFF'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • HearingEvent: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: YOUNG, TOM; Location: COURTROOM 3D; Result: BONDED PRIOR TO IA'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 12/01/2021 AT 1:00 PM IN 3D BEFORE JUDGE: YOUNG, TOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/01/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CF 003477

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant