This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/23/2021 at 23:10:14 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ROMERO-GONZALEZ, GUILLERMO ARMANDO

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROMERO-GONZALEZ, GUILLERMO ARMANDO. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III and JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2850

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ROMERO-GONZALEZ, GUILLERMO ARMANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

RICE, ELIZABETH ESQ

 

Court Documents

PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 02/05/2021 AT 10:45 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

12/18/2020: PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 02/05/2021 AT 10:45 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

12/17/2020: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL, REQUEST FOR COPY OF CHARGING, DOCUMENT(S), WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT, AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

12/17/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL, REQUEST FOR COPY OF CHARGING, DOCUMENT(S), WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT, AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

12/1/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

SURETY BOND 2020-AA-071894 POSTED $500.00

11/25/2020: SURETY BOND 2020-AA-071894 POSTED $500.00

CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

11/24/2020: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: RESIST ARREST WITHOUT VIOLENCE (843.02); Degree: F; Level: M; Disposition: CONSOLIDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: ENCOMPASSED INTO: 2020 CF 003460

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: NOA RECEIVED SET FOR PT AND TR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketEntry: LINE DOCKETED IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: NOA RECEIVED SET FOR PT AND TR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: 2 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 02/05/2021 AT 10:45 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL, REQUEST FOR COPY OF CHARGING, DOCUMENT(S), WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT, AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2020
  • HearingEvent: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III; Location: HEARING ROOM 6D; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/03/2020 AT 8:05 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/18/2020 AT 1:00 PM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 11/24/2020 AT 1:00 PM IN 6D BEFORE JUDGE: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 002850

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less