This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/23/2021 at 23:08:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ROBERTS, SHIRLEY JEAN

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROBERTS, SHIRLEY JEAN. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III and JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2849

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ROBERTS, SHIRLEY JEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

12/4/2020: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

PUBLIC DEFENDER PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 02/02/2021 AT 10:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

12/4/2020: PUBLIC DEFENDER PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 02/02/2021 AT 10:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT

12/4/2020: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT

INFORMATION

12/2/2020: INFORMATION

NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

12/1/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

CASH BOND 2029751 A POSTED $500.00

11/30/2020: CASH BOND 2029751 A POSTED $500.00

CASH BOND 2029750 A POSTED $500.00

11/30/2020: CASH BOND 2029750 A POSTED $500.00

CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

11/24/2020: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

11/24/2020: NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: PUBLIC DEFENDER PRE-TRIAL; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: NOA RECEIVED SET FOR PT AND TR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (784.03 1A1); Degree: F; Level: M; Disposition: NOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • ChargeCount: 2; Description: BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (784.03 1A1); Degree: F; Level: M; Disposition: NOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: CRPDFS WAIVED $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: CRPDFF WAIVED $49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PUBLIC DEFENDER PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 02/02/2021 AT 10:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2020
  • HearingEvent: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III; Location: HEARING ROOM 6D; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/18/2020 AT 1:00 PM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/03/2020 AT 8:05 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 11/24/2020 AT 1:00 PM IN 6D BEFORE JUDGE: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 002849

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less