This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/23/2021 at 23:08:51 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. REYES DENIZARD, ORLANDO

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against REYES DENIZARD, ORLANDO. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2909

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

REYES DENIZARD, ORLANDO

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $430.50 RECEIPT #2021000135

1/4/2021: PAYMENT $430.50 RECEIPT #2021000135

WAIVER OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL, FILED IN OPEN CT

1/4/2021: WAIVER OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL, FILED IN OPEN CT

PLEA AGREEMENT

1/4/2021: PLEA AGREEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: PLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: HUNTING OR FISHING IN AN AREA POSTED AS CLOSED OR DURING CLOSED SEASON (379.401 2A); Degree: S; Level: M; Disposition: ADJ GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $430.50 RECEIPT #2021000135

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL, FILED IN OPEN CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLEA AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: FINGERPRINTS CONCERNING ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: * TO PAY FINE & COURT COSTS OF $430.50 (X) PAY TODAY - RECORDED (OR.5863.2152. / 2021000257)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: 0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/04/2021 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 002909

    Read MoreRead Less