This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/23/2021 at 23:08:08 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. REED, TINA MARIE

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against REED, TINA MARIE. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III and JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2848

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

REED, TINA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

12/30/2020: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

NO INFORMATION

12/21/2020: NO INFORMATION

NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

12/1/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

SURETY BOND AS1K526897 POSTED $1,000.00

11/30/2020: SURETY BOND AS1K526897 POSTED $1,000.00

NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

11/24/2020: NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

OSCEOLA COUNTY CORRECTIONS/OUT ON BOND FORM

11/24/2020: OSCEOLA COUNTY CORRECTIONS/OUT ON BOND FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: VIOL INJUCT PROTECT EXPLOIT VULNERABLE (825.1036 4A); Degree: F; Level: M; Disposition: NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION NOT FILED YET, RESET FOR ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/19/2021 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • HearingEvent: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: OSCEOLA COUNTY CORRECTIONS/OUT ON BOND FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/18/2020 AT 11:00 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/03/2020 AT 8:05 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 11/24/2020 AT 1:00 PM IN 6D BEFORE JUDGE: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 002848

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less