This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 15:04:14 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. RAMIREZ, ANTHONY LUIS

Case Summary

On 02/06/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RAMIREZ, ANTHONY LUIS. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0516

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RAMIREZ, ANTHONY LUIS

 

Court Documents

COLLECTION THIRD NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

5/9/2019: COLLECTION THIRD NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

COLLECTION SECOND NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

4/8/2019: COLLECTION SECOND NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

3/7/2019: COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

PAYMENT $250.00 RECEIPT #2018025029

3/12/2018: PAYMENT $250.00 RECEIPT #2018025029

COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE OFFICE APPLICATION

3/6/2018: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE OFFICE APPLICATION

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

3/6/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT SCHEDULE

3/6/2018: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT SCHEDULE

COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT

3/6/2018: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT

WAIVER OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL, FILED IN OPEN CT

3/6/2018: WAIVER OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL, FILED IN OPEN CT

PLEA AGREEMENT

3/6/2018: PLEA AGREEMENT

INFORMATION FILED

3/2/2018: INFORMATION FILED

CASH BOND 02025959A POSTED $250.00

2/6/2018: CASH BOND 02025959A POSTED $250.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketEntry: MAIL RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketEntry: SENT TO COLLECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COLLECTION THIRD NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketEntry: MAIL RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COLLECTION SECOND NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketEntry: MAIL RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: RECORDED DOCUMENT RETURNED FROM RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: RECORDED DOCUMENT RETURNED FROM RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: DISCHARGE OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION NOT FILED YET, RESET FOR ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 03/06/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 02/27/2018 AT 8:10 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: MAIL RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CASH BOND 02025959A POSTED $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED $250 ORIGINAL BOND AMOUNT ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/06/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 MM 000516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less