This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 12:25:14 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. QUINONES, RAMON MODESTO

Case Summary

On 08/17/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against QUINONES, RAMON MODESTO. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DRAPER, CAROL E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2526

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DRAPER, CAROL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

QUINONES, RAMON MODESTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MELENDEZ, CARLOS J

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION

4/4/2018: MOTION FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION

PAYMENT $325.50 RECEIPT #2018016291

2/16/2018: PAYMENT $325.50 RECEIPT #2018016291

WAIVER OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL, FILED IN OPEN CT

2/16/2018: WAIVER OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL, FILED IN OPEN CT

PLEA AGREEMENT

2/16/2018: PLEA AGREEMENT

SENTENCED TO PROBATION

2/16/2018: SENTENCED TO PROBATION

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

2/2/2018: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT REQUEST FOR COPY OF INDICTMENT OR INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR TEN DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS

1/24/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT REQUEST FOR COPY OF INDICTMENT OR INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR TEN DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

1/10/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

REJECTION FROM COUNTY DIVERSION PROGRAM

12/27/2017: REJECTION FROM COUNTY DIVERSION PROGRAM

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

10/24/2017: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

REFERRED TO THE COUNTY DIVERSION PROGRAM DEFENDANT WAIVES SPEEDY TRIAL CASE SET FOR CDP STATUS HEARING

10/24/2017: REFERRED TO THE COUNTY DIVERSION PROGRAM DEFENDANT WAIVES SPEEDY TRIAL CASE SET FOR CDP STATUS HEARING

NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

10/23/2017: NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

9/21/2017: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2017091402

9/20/2017: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2017091402

SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED - POLK COUNTY

8/30/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED - POLK COUNTY

SUMMONS ISSUED

8/18/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED

CRIMINAL CASE FILED - DIRECT INFORMATION AFFIDAVIT OF PROSECUTIONAL SUMMARY MEMORANDUM

8/17/2017: CRIMINAL CASE FILED - DIRECT INFORMATION AFFIDAVIT OF PROSECUTIONAL SUMMARY MEMORANDUM

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: RECORDED DOCUMENT RETURNED FROM RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: RECORDED DOCUMENT RETURNED FROM RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • HearingEvent: PLEA DATE CERTAIN; Judge: DRAPER, CAROL E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: PETIT THEFT OF $100 OR MORE (812.014 2E); Degree: F; Level: M; Disposition: ADJ GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $325.50 RECEIPT #2018016291

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL, FILED IN OPEN CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLEA AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SENTENCED TO PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2017
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: DRAPER, CAROL E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2017091402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT PLED NOT GUILTY CASE SET FOR PRE-TRIAL PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED PAY $50.00 PUBLIC DEFENDER APPLICATION FEE DUE BY 9/26/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 10/24/2017 AT 8:15 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: DRAPER, CAROL E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED - POLK COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 09/20/2017 AT 8:15 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: DRAPER, CAROL E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE FILED - DIRECT INFORMATION AFFIDAVIT OF PROSECUTIONAL SUMMARY MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/17/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 MM 002526

    Read MoreRead Less