This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/09/2020 at 13:44:13 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. PAVESE, BRITTANY LYNN

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PAVESE, BRITTANY LYNN. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DRAPER, CAROL E and JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2610

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DRAPER, CAROL E

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PAVESE, BRITTANY LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $433.00 RECEIPT #2018039524

4/20/2018: PAYMENT $433.00 RECEIPT #2018039524

PAYMENT $115.00 RECEIPT #2018012233

2/6/2018: PAYMENT $115.00 RECEIPT #2018012233

PAYMENT $110.00 RECEIPT #2017120838

12/22/2017: PAYMENT $110.00 RECEIPT #2017120838

CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

11/14/2017: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

PLEA AGREEMENT

11/6/2017: PLEA AGREEMENT

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

10/24/2017: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF FAVORABLE EVIDENCE

10/23/2017: DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF FAVORABLE EVIDENCE

NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

10/16/2017: NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

10/2/2017: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2017094029

9/28/2017: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2017094029

INFORMATION FILED

9/20/2017: INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

9/6/2017: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

SURETY BOND BB5619286 POSTED $500.00

9/1/2017: SURETY BOND BB5619286 POSTED $500.00

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON MOTION FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF COMUNITY CONTROL - GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF COMUNITY CONTROL, CC JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $433.00 RECEIPT #2018039524

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $115.00 RECEIPT #2018012233

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: RECORDED DOCUMENT RETURNED FROM RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: RECORDED DOCUMENT RETURNED FROM RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $110.00 RECEIPT #2017120838

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • HearingEvent: JURY TRIAL; Judge: DRAPER, CAROL E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: PLED

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • HearingEvent: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: HEARING ROOM 6D; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 08/25/2017 AT 1:00 PM IN 6D BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 09/07/2017 AT 8:05 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: DRAPER, CAROL E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 09/25/2017 AT 8:15 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: DRAPER, CAROL E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/25/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 MM 002610

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less