This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 15:35:56 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. OSBORN, CASSANDRA MARIE

Case Summary

On 02/08/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against OSBORN, CASSANDRA MARIE. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DRAPER, CAROL E and JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0575

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DRAPER, CAROL E

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

OSBORN, CASSANDRA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DUNLOP, PHILIP T

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

9/4/2018: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

PLEA AGREEMENT

6/11/2018: PLEA AGREEMENT

NOTICE OF PRIOR CONVICTION & CRIMINAL HISTORY

5/15/2018: NOTICE OF PRIOR CONVICTION & CRIMINAL HISTORY

NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

5/15/2018: NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

4/16/2018: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 05/29/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: DRAPER, CAROL E

4/12/2018: PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 05/29/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: DRAPER, CAROL E

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES

4/12/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES

DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DISCLOSURE OF BRADY MATERIAL

4/12/2018: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND DISCLOSURE OF BRADY MATERIAL

WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED

3/15/2018: WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED

NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

3/15/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

SURETY BOND BB5679170 POSTED $2,999.00

3/14/2018: SURETY BOND BB5679170 POSTED $2,999.00

SUMMONS/SUBPOENA RETURNED UNSERVED

3/8/2018: SUMMONS/SUBPOENA RETURNED UNSERVED

SUMMONS ISSUED

2/9/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED

CRIMINAL CASE FILED - DIRECT INFORMATION AFFIDAVIT OF PROSECUTIONAL SUMMARY MEMORANDUM

2/8/2018: CRIMINAL CASE FILED - DIRECT INFORMATION AFFIDAVIT OF PROSECUTIONAL SUMMARY MEMORANDUM

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • DocketEntry: RECORDED DOCUMENT RETURNED FROM RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: RECORDED DOCUMENT RETURNED FROM RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • HearingEvent: SENTENCING; Judge: DRAPER, CAROL E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: PLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: PETIT THEFT OF $100 OR MORE (812.014 2E); Degree: F; Level: M; Disposition: ADJ GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: *AMENDED AS TO CONSECUTIVE CASE NUMBER* SENTENCED TO PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: SENTENCED TO PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: 58 DAYS (IC) AS OF 10/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER REVOKING BOND AND/OR PTR AND/OR ROR

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: DRAPER, CAROL E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: FAIL TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: WARRANT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR FOR ARRAIGNMENT $2,999.00 BOND WARRANT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS/SUBPOENA RETURNED UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 03/09/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: DRAPER, CAROL E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE FILED - DIRECT INFORMATION AFFIDAVIT OF PROSECUTIONAL SUMMARY MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/08/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 MM 000575

    Read MoreRead Less