This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 03/27/2020 at 05:08:53 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ODEKIRK, GUY MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ODEKIRK, GUY MICHAEL. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E and CHIU, VINCENT S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0217

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

CHIU, VINCENT S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ODEKIRK, GUY MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

KELLEY, RICHARD NICK

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION

3/23/2020: NO INFORMATION

AFFIDAVIT

3/10/2020: AFFIDAVIT

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

2/27/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA , WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

2/4/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA , WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

PRETRIAL RELEASE ORDER

1/29/2020: PRETRIAL RELEASE ORDER

CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

1/27/2020: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

1/28/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

CASH BOND 2028670 A POSTED $300.00

1/27/2020: CASH BOND 2028670 A POSTED $300.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (784.03 1A1); Degree: F; Level: M; Disposition: NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE FROM JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: NOA RECEIVED SET FOR PT AND TR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • HearingEvent: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA , WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL RELEASE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 02/19/2020 AT 8:15 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 02/06/2020 AT 8:05 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: WEEKEND INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 01/26/2020 AT 9:34 AM IN WE BEFORE JUDGE: CHIU, VINCENT S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/27/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 000217

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • HearingEvent: WEEKEND INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: CHIU, VINCENT S; Location: WEEKEND IA'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less