This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/23/2021 at 23:07:14 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. NIEVES-ORTIZ, FLOR SOBEIDA

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against NIEVES-ORTIZ, FLOR SOBEIDA. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E, JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C and MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2847

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

NIEVES-ORTIZ, FLOR SOBEIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION

1/15/2021: NO INFORMATION

NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

11/30/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

SURETY BOND 562565189-2 POSTED $1,500.00

11/25/2020: SURETY BOND 562565189-2 POSTED $1,500.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (784.03 1A1); Degree: F; Level: M; Disposition: NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: CRPDFS WAIVED $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: CRPDFF WAIVED $49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED PROVISIONALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION NOT FILED YET, RESET FOR ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 02/04/2021 AT 8:15 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2020
  • HearingEvent: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III; Location: HEARING ROOM 6D; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/08/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/03/2020 AT 8:05 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 11/24/2020 AT 1:00 PM IN 6D BEFORE JUDGE: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 002847

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less