This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/16/2020 at 01:53:30 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MORIN, CHRISTOPHER JAMIE

Case Summary

On 10/08/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MORIN, CHRISTOPHER JAMIE. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E, DRAPER, CAROL E, TYNAN, GREG A and EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3361

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

DRAPER, CAROL E

TYNAN, GREG A

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MORIN, CHRISTOPHER JAMIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE FAILED TO RETURN AFTER COURT OR PRISON - 60 DAYS

1/22/2020: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE FAILED TO RETURN AFTER COURT OR PRISON - 60 DAYS

ADMISSION OF VOP/COMMUNITY CONTROL FORM

8/16/2019: ADMISSION OF VOP/COMMUNITY CONTROL FORM

WARRANT EXECUTED:

8/9/2019: WARRANT EXECUTED:

VIOLATION OF PROBATION FILED AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION (COPY) VIOLATION OF PROBATION WARRANT ISSUED ISSUED 07/24/2019

7/25/2019: VIOLATION OF PROBATION FILED AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION (COPY) VIOLATION OF PROBATION WARRANT ISSUED ISSUED 07/24/2019

CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

4/5/2019: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

PLEA AGREEMENT

4/2/2019: PLEA AGREEMENT

NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

3/18/2019: NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

3/18/2019: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

3/14/2019: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

2/20/2019: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

SURETY BOND BB5784347 POSTED $1,000.00

2/18/2019: SURETY BOND BB5784347 POSTED $1,000.00

WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED

2/14/2019: WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED

PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 01/30/2019 AT 8:15 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: DRAPER, CAROL E

11/19/2018: PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 01/30/2019 AT 8:15 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: DRAPER, CAROL E

SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED

10/24/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/9/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE FAILED TO RETURN AFTER COURT OR PRISON - 60 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: FINGERPRINTS CONCERNING ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ADMISSION OF VOP/COMMUNITY CONTROL FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • HearingEvent: V.O.P. ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: COURTROOM 5B; Result: PLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT ADMITS TO THE VIOLATION OF PROBATION - ADJUDICATED GUILTY * PREVIOUS PROBATION REVOKED & TERMINATED. 1. YOU SHALL BE INCARCERATED IN THE OSCEOLA COUNTY JAIL FOR A PERIOD OF 59 DAYS WITH CREDIT FOR 25 DAYS. * TO PAY OUTSTANDING BALANCE OF $368.00 * TO PAY PUBLIC DEFENDER APPLICATION FEE OF $50.00 * TO PAY COST OF DEFENSE OF $50.00 * YOU MUST REPORT IMMEDIATELY TO THE CLERK'S COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PROGRAM LOCATED ON THE 2ND FLOOR TO PAY YOUR MONETARY OBLIGATIONS OR MAKE PAYMENT ARRANGEMENTS. IF YOU ARE INCARCERATED, YOU MUST REPORT WITHIN FIVE (5) BUSINESS DAYS OF RELEASE FOR PAYMENT PLAN * PAY $200.00 BACK COST OF SUPERVISION PAYABLE DIRECTLY TO PROBATION WITHIN 90 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketEntry: 25 DAYS IC AS OF 8/15/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WARRANT EXECUTED:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • HearingEvent: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: TYNAN, GREG A; Location: HEARING ROOM 6D; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketEntry: V.O.P. ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 08/15/2019 AT 8:05 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2018
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: DRAPER, CAROL E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: CLERK'S NOTE TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS DEFENDANT DEEMED NOT INDIGENT BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT PLED NOT GUILTY CASE SET FOR PRE-TRIAL DEFENDANT TO HIRE OWN ATTORNEY PER THE COURT, DEFENDANT DOES NOT QUALIFY FOR THE SERVICES OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 01/14/2019 AT 8:15 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: DRAPER, CAROL E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 10/31/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: DRAPER, CAROL E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE FILED - DIRECT INFORMATION AFFIDAVIT OF PROSECUTIONAL SUMMARY MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 10/08/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 MM 003361

    Read MoreRead Less