This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 22:01:29 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MINUTY, BAKIRH CHANGA

Case Summary

On 07/20/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MINUTY, BAKIRH CHANGA. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OBRIEN, HEATHER K, DRAPER, CAROL E and SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2403

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OBRIEN, HEATHER K

DRAPER, CAROL E

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MINUTY, BAKIRH CHANGA

Not Yet Classified

GOMEZ, NATALY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CRANTON, GEORGE D ESQ

 

Court Documents

CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

7/20/2018: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

7/20/2018: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

7/20/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

7/20/2018: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

7/20/2018: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

7/20/2018: NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

SURETY BOND 562246823-9 POSTED $1,000.00

7/23/2018: SURETY BOND 562246823-9 POSTED $1,000.00

NO INFORMATION

8/13/2018: NO INFORMATION

CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

8/16/2018: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: DRAPER, CAROL E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: NOA RECEIVED SET FOR PT AND TR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (784.03 1A1); Degree: F; Level: M; Disposition: NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • HearingEvent: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: OBRIEN, HEATHER K; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Result: NOA RECEIVED SET FOR PT AND TR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND 562246823-9 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • HearingEvent: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: SCHREIBER, MARGARET H; Location: HEARING ROOM 6D; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 07/20/2018 AT 1:00 PM IN 6D BEFORE JUDGE: SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 08/02/2018 AT 8:05 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: OBRIEN, HEATHER K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 08/15/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: DRAPER, CAROL E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/20/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 MM 002403

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRANTON, GEORGE D ESQ