This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/23/2021 at 23:09:39 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. MALAVE-PEDRAZA, RAMON

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MALAVE-PEDRAZA, RAMON. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2899

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MALAVE-PEDRAZA, RAMON

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION

1/5/2021: INFORMATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E; Location: COURTROOM 4E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT DENIED ENTRY TO THE COURTHOUSE DUE TO ANSWERING "YES" TO ONE OR MORE ENTRY QUESTION CASE RESET FOR ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/29/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: 0 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/11/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 002899

    Read MoreRead Less