This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 20:05:34 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. HAZLEY, ANGELIQUE MONICA

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HAZLEY, ANGELIQUE MONICA. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E, TYNAN, GREG A, ADAMS, JOHN H SR, EPPERSON, HAL C JR, JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C and DRAPER, CAROL E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3938

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

TYNAN, GREG A

ADAMS, JOHN H SR

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

DRAPER, CAROL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HAZLEY, ANGELIQUE MONICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

ADMISSION OF VOP/COMMUNITY CONTROL FORM

7/17/2019: ADMISSION OF VOP/COMMUNITY CONTROL FORM

WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED

6/17/2019: WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED

VIOLATION OF PROBATION FILED AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION NOTICE TO APPEAR

5/31/2019: VIOLATION OF PROBATION FILED AFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF PROBATION NOTICE TO APPEAR

PLEA AGREEMENT

1/28/2019: PLEA AGREEMENT

NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

1/17/2019: NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

1/17/2019: NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH BRADY

1/16/2019: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH BRADY

WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED

12/18/2018: WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED

SUMMONS/SUBPOENA RETURNED UNSERVED

12/11/2018: SUMMONS/SUBPOENA RETURNED UNSERVED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/21/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • HearingEvent: V.O.P. STATUS HEARING; Judge: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketEntry: FINGERPRINTS CONCERNING ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ADMISSION OF VOP/COMMUNITY CONTROL FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketEntry: 1. YOU SHALL BE INCARCERATED IN THE OSCEOLA COUNTY JAIL FOR A PERIOD OF 45 DAYS WITH CREDIT FOR 36 DAYS (X) CONCURRENT TO 18MM-3976 * REVIOUS PROBATION REVOKED & TERMINATED. * ADJUDICATION OF GUILT AS TO THE VOP * TO PAY OUTSTANDING BALANCE OF $273.00 * YOU MUST REPORT IMMEDIATELY TO THE CLERK'S COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PROGRAM LOCATED ON THE 2ND FLOOR TO PAY YOUR MONETARY OBLIGATIONS OR MAKE PAYMENT ARRANGEMENTS. IF YOU ARE INCARCERATED, YOU MUST REPORT WITHIN FIVE (5) BUSINESS DAYS OF RELEASE. * MAY DO COMMUNITY SERVICE HOURS FOR COURT COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED ORDER DEFENDANT DENIES THE VIOLATION OF PROBATION CASE SET FOR VOP STATUS HEARING NUNC PRO TUNC 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • HearingEvent: V.O.P. ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT DENIES THE VIOLATION OF PROBATION CASE SET FOR VOP STATUS HEARING DEFENDANT DENIES THE VIOLATION OF PROBATION CASE SET FOR VOP STATUS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: V.O.P. STATUS HEARING SET FOR 08/01/2019 AT 1:30 PM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: 17 DAYS IC (AS OF 6/27/19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 12/18/2018 AT 1:00 PM IN 6D BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: DRAPER, CAROL E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: FAIL TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: WARRANT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR FOR ARRAIGNMENT $19,999.00 BOND WARRANT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS/SUBPOENA RETURNED UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/14/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: DRAPER, CAROL E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE FILED - DIRECT INFORMATION AFFIDAVIT OF PROSECUTIONAL SUMMARY MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/20/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 MM 003938

    Read MoreRead Less