This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/27/2023 at 23:18:19 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. HARRIS, BRIAN JAY

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HARRIS, BRIAN JAY. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BEAMER, JOHN and YOUNG, TOM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3389

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BEAMER, JOHN

YOUNG, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HARRIS, BRIAN JAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

11/28/2022: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AUTOMATIC RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE- GRANTED

1/9/2023: ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AUTOMATIC RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE- GRANTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEntry: CRPDFS WAIVED $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEntry: CRPDFF WAIVED $49.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER TRANSFERRED TO 2023 MM 000091

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AUTOMATIC RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE- GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: BATTERY SIMPLE- LEO. FIREFIGHTER, EMT, ETC (784.07 2b); Degree: T; Level: F; Disposition: NO ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • ChargeCount: 2; Description: RESISTING- SIMPLE OBSTRUCT WITH VIOLENCE (843.01); Degree: T; Level: F; Disposition: NO ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • ChargeCount: 3; Description: RESISTING OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE (843.02); Degree: F; Level: M; Disposition: TRANS TO OTHER COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR AUTOMATIC RELEASE ON RECOGNIZANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: WEEKEND INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 11/26/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN WE BEFORE JUDGE: YOUNG, TOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/28/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CF 003389

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2022
  • HearingEvent: WEEKEND INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: YOUNG, TOM; Location: WEEKEND IA'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant