This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 23:50:22 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. HAMILTON, CIMBERLEE ANN

Case Summary

On 03/21/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HAMILTON, CIMBERLEE ANN. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DRAPER, CAROL E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1054

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DRAPER, CAROL E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HAMILTON, CIMBERLEE ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

UMANSKY, ZAHRA

 

Court Documents

CDP TERMINATION FILED AWAITING NOLLE PROSEQUI TO CLOSE OUT CASE

10/15/2018: CDP TERMINATION FILED AWAITING NOLLE PROSEQUI TO CLOSE OUT CASE

PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2018086910

9/7/2018: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2018086910

JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE & ABEYANCE

7/24/2018: JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE & ABEYANCE

WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

5/25/2018: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

DEFENDANT REFERRED TO THE COUNTY DIVERSION PROGRAM DEFENDANT WAIVES SPEEDY TRIAL CASE SET FOR CDP STATUS HEARING

4/25/2018: DEFENDANT REFERRED TO THE COUNTY DIVERSION PROGRAM DEFENDANT WAIVES SPEEDY TRIAL CASE SET FOR CDP STATUS HEARING

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

4/23/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

4/9/2018: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

4/4/2018: NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 05/29/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: DRAPER, CAROL E

3/28/2018: PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 05/29/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: DRAPER, CAROL E

INFORMATION FILED

3/28/2018: INFORMATION FILED

DEFENSE DEMAND FOR EXCULPATORY INFORMATION

3/23/2018: DEFENSE DEMAND FOR EXCULPATORY INFORMATION

DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF CRIMINAL RECORDS

3/23/2018: DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF CRIMINAL RECORDS

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

3/23/2018: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

3/23/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CDP TERMINATION FILED AWAITING NOLLE PROSEQUI TO CLOSE OUT CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2018086910

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • HearingEvent: CDP STATUS HEARING; Judge: DRAPER, CAROL E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: PETIT THEFT (812.014 3A); Degree: S; Level: M; Disposition: PRE-TRIAL DIVERSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE & ABEYANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL; Judge: DRAPER, CAROL E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • HearingEvent: STATUS HEARING; Judge: DRAPER, CAROL E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 05/29/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: DRAPER, CAROL E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENSE DEMAND FOR EXCULPATORY INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF CRIMINAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 04/16/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: DRAPER, CAROL E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/21/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 MM 001054

    Read MoreRead Less