This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 23:44:30 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. GOVEO-RODRIGUEZ, JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 07/31/2017 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GOVEO-RODRIGUEZ, JOSEPH. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is OBRIEN, HEATHER K. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2304

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

OBRIEN, HEATHER K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GOVEO-RODRIGUEZ, JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MACK, CHRISTOPHER A

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

12/11/2017: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

PLEA AGREEMENT

12/1/2017: PLEA AGREEMENT

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

10/31/2017: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE FOR PRETRIAL IS TO BE FILE BY ATTORNEY CASE RESET FOR PLEA DATE CERTAIN

10/31/2017: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE FOR PRETRIAL IS TO BE FILE BY ATTORNEY CASE RESET FOR PLEA DATE CERTAIN

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

10/18/2017: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

10/18/2017: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

NOTICE OF JUDICIAL NOTICE REQUEST

10/13/2017: NOTICE OF JUDICIAL NOTICE REQUEST

NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

10/13/2017: NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

10/13/2017: NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 10/31/2017 AT 8:00 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: OBRIEN, HEATHER K

8/23/2017: PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 10/31/2017 AT 8:00 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: OBRIEN, HEATHER K

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL WAIVER OF PERSONAL APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE AND REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY

8/22/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL WAIVER OF PERSONAL APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE AND REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY

INFORMATION FILED

8/14/2017: INFORMATION FILED

SURETY BOND PSE210401 POSTED $250.00

7/31/2017: SURETY BOND PSE210401 POSTED $250.00

CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED $250 ORIGINAL BOND AMOUNT ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

7/31/2017: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED $250 ORIGINAL BOND AMOUNT ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketEntry: RECORDED DOCUMENT RETURNED FROM RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: RECORDED DOCUMENT RETURNED FROM RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • HearingEvent: PLEA DATE CERTAIN; Judge: OBRIEN, HEATHER K; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Result: PLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: POSSESSION OF CANNABIS < 20 GRAMS (893.13 6B); Degree: F; Level: M; Disposition: ADJ WITHHELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLEA AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketEntry: 01 DAYS OSCEOLA COUNTY JAIL 01 DAYS CREDIT TIME SERVED $383.000 COURT COSTS (INCLUDES $50 PROSECUTION FEE) PAY WITHIN 120 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: 1 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketEntry: MAIL RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 10/31/2017 AT 8:00 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: OBRIEN, HEATHER K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL WAIVER OF PERSONAL APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE AND REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 08/23/2017 AT 8:00 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: OBRIEN, HEATHER K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND PSE210401 POSTED $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED $250 ORIGINAL BOND AMOUNT ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/31/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 MM 002304

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less