This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/23/2021 at 23:07:03 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. GOULD, LATRYCE DANIELLE

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GOULD, LATRYCE DANIELLE. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III, EPPERSON, HAL C JR and JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2846

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GOULD, LATRYCE DANIELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

AGENCY SUPPLEMENTAL REPORTS

12/16/2020: AGENCY SUPPLEMENTAL REPORTS

INFORMATION

12/9/2020: INFORMATION

NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

11/24/2020: NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: COURTROOM 5B; Result: FAIL TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: WARRANT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR FOR ARRAIGNMENT $ 500.00 BOND WARRANT ISSUED AS TO COUNT 1 $ 100.00 BOND WARRANT ISSUED AS TO COUNT 2 $ 100.00 BOND WARRANT ISSUED AS TO COUNT 3 PRETRIAL RELEASE REVOKED SPEEDY TRIAL WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: 2 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AGENCY SUPPLEMENTAL REPORTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • HearingEvent: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL RELEASE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/04/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/03/2020 AT 8:05 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 11/24/2020 AT 1:00 PM IN 6D BEFORE JUDGE: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 002846

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less