This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/14/2020 at 20:46:38 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. GONZALEZ, ELIJAH ISAIAH

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GONZALEZ, ELIJAH ISAIAH. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OBRIEN, HEATHER K, BARBOUR, ELAINE A and JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2311

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OBRIEN, HEATHER K

BARBOUR, ELAINE A

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GONZALEZ, ELIJAH ISAIAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $17.00 RECEIPT #2019098717

10/10/2019: PAYMENT $17.00 RECEIPT #2019098717

PAYMENT $25.00 RECEIPT #2019094131

9/26/2019: PAYMENT $25.00 RECEIPT #2019094131

COLLECTION SECOND NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

9/13/2019: COLLECTION SECOND NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

PAYMENT $8.00 RECEIPT #2019059973

6/18/2019: PAYMENT $8.00 RECEIPT #2019059973

PAYMENT $26.00 RECEIPT #2019058781

6/13/2019: PAYMENT $26.00 RECEIPT #2019058781

PAYMENT $56.00 RECEIPT #2019056158

6/6/2019: PAYMENT $56.00 RECEIPT #2019056158

COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

4/4/2019: COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

PAYMENT $40.00 RECEIPT #2019034284

4/4/2019: PAYMENT $40.00 RECEIPT #2019034284

COLLECTION SECOND NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

3/5/2019: COLLECTION SECOND NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

1/30/2019: COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2018114539

11/30/2018: PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2018114539

COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT

9/27/2018: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT

COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT SCHEDULE

9/27/2018: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT SCHEDULE

PLEA AGREEMENT

9/27/2018: PLEA AGREEMENT

NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

8/27/2018: NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION

8/21/2018: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION

INFORMATION FILED

7/26/2018: INFORMATION FILED

FIRST APPEARANCE -RELEASED PRIOR TO HEARING

7/13/2018: FIRST APPEARANCE -RELEASED PRIOR TO HEARING

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $17.00 RECEIPT #2019098717

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $25.00 RECEIPT #2019094131

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COLLECTION SECOND NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $8.00 RECEIPT #2019059973

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $26.00 RECEIPT #2019058781

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $56.00 RECEIPT #2019056158

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COLLECTION THIRD NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $40.00 RECEIPT #2019034284

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COLLECTION SECOND NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2018
  • HearingEvent: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: BARBOUR, ELAINE A; Location: HEARING ROOM 6D; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE -RELEASED PRIOR TO HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 07/13/2018 AT 1:00 PM IN 6D BEFORE JUDGE: BARBOUR, ELAINE A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 07/26/2018 AT 8:05 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 07/31/2018 AT 8:00 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: OBRIEN, HEATHER K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/13/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 MM 002311

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less