This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/23/2020 at 20:05:04 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. GARDNER, CARLOS LAMAR

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GARDNER, CARLOS LAMAR. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E, EPPERSON, HAL C JR and JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2862

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GARDNER, CARLOS LAMAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION

12/15/2020: INFORMATION

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

11/25/2020: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

OSCEOLA COUNTY CORRECTIONS/OUT ON BOND FORM

11/25/2020: OSCEOLA COUNTY CORRECTIONS/OUT ON BOND FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: COURTROOM 5B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO CONTINUE THE FINDING OF INCOMPETENCE AND PLACING THE DEFENDANT ON CONDITIONAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO CONTINUE THE FINDING OF INCOMPETENCE AND PLACING THE DEFENDANT ON CONDITIONAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: 2 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • HearingEvent: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • HearingEvent: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E; Location: HEARING ROOM 6D; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: OSCEOLA COUNTY CORRECTIONS/OUT ON BOND FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/04/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/03/2020 AT 8:05 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 11/25/2020 AT 1:00 PM IN 6D BEFORE JUDGE: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 002862

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less