This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 15:42:16 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. GALLON, EDDIE TYRONE

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GALLON, EDDIE TYRONE. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OBRIEN, HEATHER K and JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2855

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OBRIEN, HEATHER K

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GALLON, EDDIE TYRONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

CRANTON, GEORGE D ESQ

 

Court Documents

CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

8/24/2018: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

8/24/2018: NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

CASH BOND 02026706A POSTED $1,000.00

8/27/2018: CASH BOND 02026706A POSTED $1,000.00

NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

8/28/2018: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

9/19/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

9/19/2018: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

9/19/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

NO INFORMATION

9/20/2018: NO INFORMATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketEntry: CRPDFS WAIVED $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketEntry: CRPDFF WAIVED $49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: DISCHARGE OF BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: OBRIEN, HEATHER K; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Result: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (784.03 1A1); Degree: F; Level: M; Disposition: NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 09/06/2018 AT 8:05 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 09/21/2018 AT 8:00 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: OBRIEN, HEATHER K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 08/24/2018 AT 1:00 PM IN 6D BEFORE JUDGE: OBRIEN, HEATHER K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/24/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 MM 002855

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRANTON, GEORGE D ESQ