This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/23/2021 at 23:09:12 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. FIGUREROA, JULIO

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FIGUREROA, JULIO. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2908

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

FIGUREROA, JULIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

STATE HAS REFERRED CASE FOR DIVERSION CONSIDERATION. ALL PTR CONDITIONS AND/OR BONDS TO REMAIN IN EFFECT PENDING FORMAL ACCEPTANCE. IT IS INCUMBANT UPON THE STATE TO RE-DOCKET CASE. SPEEDY TRIAL IS HEREBY WAIVED DEFENDANT TO CONTACT PROBATION WITHIN 24 HOURS APRIL STACK VIA PHONE 407-742-4719 TO COMMENCE COUNTY DIVERSION PROGRAM PUBLIC DEFENDER PROVISIONALLY APPOINTED

1/8/2021: STATE HAS REFERRED CASE FOR DIVERSION CONSIDERATION. ALL PTR CONDITIONS AND/OR BONDS TO REMAIN IN EFFECT PENDING FORMAL ACCEPTANCE. IT IS INCUMBANT UPON THE STATE TO RE-DOCKET CASE. SPEEDY TRIAL IS HEREBY WAIVED DEFENDANT TO CONTACT PROBATION WITHIN 24 HOURS APRIL STACK VIA PHONE 407-742-4719 TO COMMENCE COUNTY DIVERSION PROGRAM PUBLIC DEFENDER PROVISIONALLY APPOINTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: COURTROOM 5B; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS PUBLIC DEFENDER PROVISIONALLY APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STATE HAS REFERRED CASE FOR DIVERSION CONSIDERATION. ALL PTR CONDITIONS AND/OR BONDS TO REMAIN IN EFFECT PENDING FORMAL ACCEPTANCE. IT IS INCUMBANT UPON THE STATE TO RE-DOCKET CASE. SPEEDY TRIAL IS HEREBY WAIVED DEFENDANT TO CONTACT PROBATION WITHIN 24 HOURS APRIL STACK VIA PHONE 407-742-4719 TO COMMENCE COUNTY DIVERSION PROGRAM PUBLIC DEFENDER PROVISIONALLY APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/08/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 002908

    Read MoreRead Less