This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/23/2021 at 23:07:45 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ESTRELLA-RODRIGUEZ, BERNICE

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ESTRELLA-RODRIGUEZ, BERNICE. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2900

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ESTRELLA-RODRIGUEZ, BERNICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION

1/5/2021: INFORMATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: PUBLIC DEFENDER PRE-TRIAL; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: COURTROOM 5B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: COURTROOM 5B; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: PUBLIC DEFENDER PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 02/09/2021 AT 2:30 PM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: STATE MOVING FORWARD WITH NOTICE TO APPEAR DEFENDANT PLED NOT GUILTY FILLED OUT AFFIDAVIT OF INSOLVENCY PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED BY JUDGE YOU ARE TO MAKE AN APPOINTMENT WITH YOUR ATTORNEY BEFORE NEXT COURT DATE CASE SET FOR PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: LINE DOCKETED IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/04/2021 AT 10:30 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 002900

    Read MoreRead Less