This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/23/2020 at 20:04:35 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. DOWDYE, DKUAN DEMOI-MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DOWDYE, DKUAN DEMOI-MICHAEL. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E, EPPERSON, HAL C JR and JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2860

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DOWDYE, DKUAN DEMOI-MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

AGENCY SUPPLEMENTAL REPORTS

12/3/2020: AGENCY SUPPLEMENTAL REPORTS

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

12/1/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

12/1/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

SURETY BOND 562565192-0 POSTED $1,000.00

11/30/2020: SURETY BOND 562565192-0 POSTED $1,000.00

SURETY BOND 562565191-7 POSTED $500.00

11/30/2020: SURETY BOND 562565191-7 POSTED $500.00

NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

11/25/2020: NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: COURTROOM 5B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • HearingEvent: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AGENCY SUPPLEMENTAL REPORTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND 562565192-0 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND 562565191-7 POSTED $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • HearingEvent: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E; Location: HEARING ROOM 6D; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/04/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/03/2020 AT 8:05 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 11/25/2020 AT 1:00 PM IN 6D BEFORE JUDGE: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 002860

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less