This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/08/2022 at 23:11:50 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. COSTE, BRYAN LEONARDO

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COSTE, BRYAN LEONARDO. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CARSTEN, KEITH and YOUNG, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0071

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CARSTEN, KEITH

YOUNG, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

COSTE, BRYAN LEONARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

KOMARA, KENNETH J

 

Court Documents

CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

1/7/2022: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE KENNETH KOMARA

1/26/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE KENNETH KOMARA

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, ENTRY OF PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL

1/26/2022: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, ENTRY OF PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

1/26/2022: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

2/1/2022: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

1/7/2022: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE KENNETH KOMARA

1/26/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE KENNETH KOMARA

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

1/26/2022: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

WAIVER OF ARRIAGNMENT, ENTRY OF PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL

1/26/2022: WAIVER OF ARRIAGNMENT, ENTRY OF PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

2/1/2022: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

INFORMATION FILED

2/15/2022: INFORMATION FILED

INFORMATION FILED

2/17/2022: INFORMATION FILED

BOND (COPY SURETY)

2/21/2022: BOND (COPY SURETY)

BOND (COPY SURETY)

2/21/2022: BOND (COPY SURETY)

AMENDED INFORMATION FILED

2/22/2022: AMENDED INFORMATION FILED

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

2/25/2022: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • HearingEvent: JURY TRIAL; Judge: CARSTEN, KEITH; Location: COURTROOM 4F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL; Judge: CARSTEN, KEITH; Location: COURTROOM 4F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • ChargeCount: 3; Description: BURGLARY OF OCCUPIED CONVEYANCE UNARMED (810.02 3D); Degree: F; Level: F; Disposition: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: JURY TRIAL SET FOR 05/09/2022 AT 8:30 AM IN 4F BEFORE JUDGE: CARSTEN, KEITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL SET FOR 04/26/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 4F BEFORE JUDGE: CARSTEN, KEITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: ENCOMPASSED INTO THIS CASE 2022 CF 000072

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: CRPDFS WAIVED $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 01/07/2022 AT 1:00 PM IN 5F BEFORE JUDGE: YOUNG, TOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 01/07/2022 AT 1:00 PM IN 5F BEFORE JUDGE: YOUNG, TOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/07/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CF 000071

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/07/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CF 000072

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOMARA, KENNETH J