This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/08/2022 at 23:11:30 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. COSTE, BRYAN LEONARDO

Case Summary

On 01/07/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COSTE, BRYAN LEONARDO. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is YOUNG, TOM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0072

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

YOUNG, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

COSTE, BRYAN LEONARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

KOMARA, KENNETH J

 

Court Documents

CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

1/7/2022: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE KENNETH KOMARA

1/26/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE KENNETH KOMARA

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

1/26/2022: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

WAIVER OF ARRIAGNMENT, ENTRY OF PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL

1/26/2022: WAIVER OF ARRIAGNMENT, ENTRY OF PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

2/1/2022: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

INFORMATION FILED

2/15/2022: INFORMATION FILED

BOND (COPY SURETY)

2/21/2022: BOND (COPY SURETY)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: BURGLARY OF OCCUPIED CONVEYANCE UNARMED (810.02 3D); Degree: F; Level: F; Disposition: CONSOLIDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • ChargeCount: 2; Description: BURGLARY OF OCCUPIED CONVEYANCE UNARMED (810.02 3D); Degree: F; Level: F; Disposition: CONSOLIDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: ENCOMPASSED INTO 2022 CF 000071

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: CRPDFS WAIVED $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: CRPDFF WAIVED $49.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND 562687202-1 POSTED $3,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND 562687203-4 POSTED $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: BOND (COPY SURETY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketEntry: LINE DOCKETED IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON JOINT MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEntry: JOINT MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • HearingEvent: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: YOUNG, TOM; Location: COURTROOM 5F; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 01/07/2022 AT 1:00 PM IN 5F BEFORE JUDGE: YOUNG, TOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/07/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CF 000072

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOMARA, KENNETH J