This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/23/2021 at 23:09:23 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CARTER, DANIELLE ANDRESSIA

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CARTER, DANIELLE ANDRESSIA. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2863

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CARTER, DANIELLE ANDRESSIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

1/22/2021: NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

INFORMATION

12/15/2020: INFORMATION

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH BRADY

12/14/2020: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH BRADY

SURETY BOND 562565187-6 POSTED $500.00

11/24/2020: SURETY BOND 562565187-6 POSTED $500.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • HearingEvent: PUBLIC DEFENDER PRE-TRIAL; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: COURTROOM 5B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: COURTROOM 5B; Result: WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: PUBLIC DEFENDER PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 02/10/2021 AT 2:30 PM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketEntry: 1 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: COURTROOM 5B; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH BRADY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION NOT FILED YET, RESET FOR ARRAIGNMENT PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/15/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/14/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND 562565187-6 POSTED $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 002863

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less