This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/11/2020 at 13:10:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BRANCHE, RICHARD ROGERS

Case Summary

On 01/11/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BRANCHE, RICHARD ROGERS. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is OBRIEN, HEATHER K. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0169

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

OBRIEN, HEATHER K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BRANCHE, RICHARD ROGERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KOMARA, KENNETH J

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2019074364

7/30/2019: PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2019074364

PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2019052730

5/28/2019: PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2019052730

COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

5/20/2019: COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

3/18/2019: COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019020519

2/28/2019: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019020519

PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019009741

1/29/2019: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019009741

PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019000471

1/2/2019: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019000471

PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2018113793

11/28/2018: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2018113793

PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2018101852

10/22/2018: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2018101852

PAYMENT $55.00 RECEIPT #2018058176

6/14/2018: PAYMENT $55.00 RECEIPT #2018058176

COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE OFFICE APPLICATION

5/15/2018: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE OFFICE APPLICATION

COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT

5/15/2018: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT

WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S ATTENDANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

4/9/2018: WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S ATTENDANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

3/26/2018: NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

2/5/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

2/5/2018: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

2/5/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS/SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED

1/26/2018: SUMMONS/SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $66.00 RECEIPT #2019086102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2019074364

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COLLECTION SECOND NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2019052730

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2019032772

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COLLECTION FIRST NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019020519

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019009741

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019000471

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2018
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: OBRIEN, HEATHER K; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Result: NOA RECEIVED SET FOR PT AND TR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 04/10/2018 AT 8:00 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: OBRIEN, HEATHER K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS/SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 02/06/2018 AT 8:00 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: OBRIEN, HEATHER K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE FILED - DIRECT INFORMATION AFFIDAVIT OF PROSECUTIONAL SUMMARY MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/11/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 MM 000169

    Read MoreRead Less