This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/27/2023 at 23:21:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BERKEY, STEVEN DOUGLA II

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BERKEY, STEVEN DOUGLA II. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are YOUNG, TOM, CARSTEN, KEITH and MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3376

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

YOUNG, TOM

CARSTEN, KEITH

MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BERKEY, STEVEN DOUGLA II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

11/28/2022: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT FROM SHERIFF'S OFFICE

12/5/2022: SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT FROM SHERIFF'S OFFICE

NO INFORMATION

12/27/2022: NO INFORMATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: BURGLARY UNOCCUPIED STRUCTURE-FORCED ENTRY (810.02 4a); Degree: T; Level: F; Disposition: NO INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • ChargeCount: 2; Description: PETIT THEFT- LT $750 (812.014 3a); Degree: S; Level: M; Disposition: NO INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NO INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT FROM SHERIFF'S OFFICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • HearingEvent: INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III; Location: COURTROOM 5D; Result: EVENT HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: RE-A FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: WEEKEND INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 11/27/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN WE BEFORE JUDGE: YOUNG, TOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: RE-IA FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: WEEKEND INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 11/26/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN WE BEFORE JUDGE: YOUNG, TOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 11/28/2022 AT 1:00 PM IN 5D BEFORE JUDGE: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/28/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CF 003376

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2022
  • HearingEvent: WEEKEND INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: YOUNG, TOM; Location: WEEKEND IA'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2022
  • HearingEvent: WEEKEND INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: YOUNG, TOM; Location: WEEKEND IA'S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant