This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/23/2021 at 23:11:51 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BALDWIN, ALAINA NICOLE

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BALDWIN, ALAINA NICOLE. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are EPPERSON, HAL C JR, CALDERON, LUIS F, ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E and JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2859

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

CALDERON, LUIS F

ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BALDWIN, ALAINA NICOLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

12/28/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

12/22/2020: NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

12/18/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

SURETY BOND AA20-673531 POSTED $500.00

12/18/2020: SURETY BOND AA20-673531 POSTED $500.00

SURETY BOND AA20-673530 POSTED $500.00

12/18/2020: SURETY BOND AA20-673530 POSTED $500.00

NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

12/17/2020: NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

INFORMATION FILED

12/17/2020: INFORMATION FILED

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH BRADY

12/14/2020: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH BRADY

WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED

11/30/2020: WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED

WARRANT ARREST-BOOKING REPORT FILED WANTED PERSONS TABLE ADVICE TO DEFENDANT

11/30/2020: WARRANT ARREST-BOOKING REPORT FILED WANTED PERSONS TABLE ADVICE TO DEFENDANT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: PUBLIC DEFENDER PRE-TRIAL; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: COURTROOM 5B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: COURTROOM 5B; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • HearingEvent: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND AA20-673531 POSTED $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND AA20-673530 POSTED $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • HearingEvent: MOTION FOR MODIFICATION; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: COURTROOM 5B; Result: HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • HearingEvent: MOTION HEARING; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: COURTROOM 5B; Result: HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WARRANT ARREST-BOOKING REPORT FILED WANTED PERSONS TABLE ADVICE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/10/2020 AT 8:05 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: WEEKEND INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 11/28/2020 AT 8:00 AM IN WE BEFORE JUDGE: CALDERON, LUIS F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2020
  • HearingEvent: WEEKEND INITIAL APPEARANCE; Judge: CALDERON, LUIS F; Location: WEEKEND IA'S; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: LINE DOCKETED IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - ARREST WARRANT FILED MEMORANDUM FILED AFFIDAVIT OF ARREST WARRANT CT1: $ 0.00 BOND AMOUNT CT2: $500.00 BOND AMOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 002859

    Read MoreRead Less