This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/23/2021 at 23:07:24 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. AQUINO GONZALEZ, KRYSTAL MARIE

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against AQUINO GONZALEZ, KRYSTAL MARIE. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III and JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2844

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

AQUINO GONZALEZ, KRYSTAL MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

11/30/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN

SURETY BOND 2020-AA-071896 POSTED $1,000.00

11/25/2020: SURETY BOND 2020-AA-071896 POSTED $1,000.00

NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

11/24/2020: NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEntry: 2 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION NOT FILED YET, RESET FOR ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/27/2021 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: RESET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION NOT FILED YET, RESET FOR ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 01/06/2021 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketEntry: MAIL RETURNED - DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: DETERMINATION OF INDIGENCY & FINAL RULING THE COURT CONCURS WITH THE CLERK AND THE PUBLIC DEFENDER IS HEREBY WITHDRAWN

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NO CONTACT WITH VICTIM(S) ORDERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/21/2020 AT 10:00 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: JAIL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 12/03/2020 AT 8:05 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: INITIAL APPEARANCE SET FOR 11/24/2020 AT 1:00 PM IN 6D BEFORE JUDGE: MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 002844

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less