This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 22:16:37 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ALVARADO-OCASIO, JOSE ALEJANDRO

Case Summary

On 03/13/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ALVARADO-OCASIO, JOSE ALEJANDRO. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0958

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ALVARADO-OCASIO, JOSE ALEJANDRO

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $68.00 RECEIPT #2019126443

12/30/2019: PAYMENT $68.00 RECEIPT #2019126443

PAYMENT $25.00 RECEIPT #2019099413

10/11/2019: PAYMENT $25.00 RECEIPT #2019099413

TERMINATION OF PROBATION

9/13/2019: TERMINATION OF PROBATION

PAYMENT $25.00 RECEIPT #2019079343

8/13/2019: PAYMENT $25.00 RECEIPT #2019079343

PAYMENT $25.00 RECEIPT #2019069940

7/17/2019: PAYMENT $25.00 RECEIPT #2019069940

PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2019061965

6/24/2019: PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2019061965

CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

3/8/2019: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019020764

2/28/2019: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019020764

WAIVER OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL, FILED IN OPEN CT

2/28/2019: WAIVER OF RIGHT TO COUNSEL, FILED IN OPEN CT

PLEA AGREEMENT

2/28/2019: PLEA AGREEMENT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

1/22/2019: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTIFICATION FROM COUNTY DIVERSION PROGRAM REJECTION

1/11/2019: NOTIFICATION FROM COUNTY DIVERSION PROGRAM REJECTION

PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 02/28/2019 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

1/10/2019: PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 02/28/2019 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

NOTIFICATION OF COUNTY DIVERSION PROGRAM REJECTION

1/10/2019: NOTIFICATION OF COUNTY DIVERSION PROGRAM REJECTION

WARRANT EXECUTED:

11/13/2018: WARRANT EXECUTED:

SURETY BOND AA18-531479 POSTED $2,000.00

11/1/2018: SURETY BOND AA18-531479 POSTED $2,000.00

SUMMONS/SUBPOENA RETURNED UNSERVED

4/12/2018: SUMMONS/SUBPOENA RETURNED UNSERVED

SUMMONS ISSUED

3/14/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $68.00 RECEIPT #2019126443

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $25.00 RECEIPT #2019099413

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: TERMINATION OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $25.00 RECEIPT #2019079343

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $25.00 RECEIPT #2019069940

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2019061965

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF COSTS IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: PLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: PETIT THEFT (812.014 3A); Degree: S; Level: M; Disposition: ADJ WITHHELD

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS/SUBPOENA RETURNED UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: FAIL TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: WARRANT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR FOR ARRAIGNMENT $2000.00 BOND WARRANT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 04/10/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE FILED - DIRECT INFORMATION AFFIDAVIT OF PROSECUTIONAL SUMMARY MEMORANDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/13/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 MM 000958

    Read MoreRead Less