This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 18:30:17 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ALMENDAREZ, JONATHAN ELIAS

Case Summary

On 05/01/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ALMENDAREZ, JONATHAN ELIAS. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1539

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ALMENDAREZ, JONATHAN ELIAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S PRO SE MOTION TO TERMINATE PROBATION

3/14/2019: DEFENDANT'S PRO SE MOTION TO TERMINATE PROBATION

PAYMENT $109.00 RECEIPT #2019020933

2/28/2019: PAYMENT $109.00 RECEIPT #2019020933

PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019009271

1/28/2019: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019009271

PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2018123567

12/27/2018: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2018123567

PAYMENT $15.00 RECEIPT #2018114712

11/30/2018: PAYMENT $15.00 RECEIPT #2018114712

PAYMENT $66.00 RECEIPT #2018106799

11/5/2018: PAYMENT $66.00 RECEIPT #2018106799

PAYMENT $67.00 RECEIPT #2018093059

9/26/2018: PAYMENT $67.00 RECEIPT #2018093059

PAYMENT $36.00 RECEIPT #2018082308

8/24/2018: PAYMENT $36.00 RECEIPT #2018082308

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) AFTER CASE WAS DISPOSED

8/1/2018: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL) AFTER CASE WAS DISPOSED

COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT

7/27/2018: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT

COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE OFFICE APPLICATION

7/27/2018: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE OFFICE APPLICATION

COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT

7/27/2018: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT

COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT SCHEDULE

7/27/2018: COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PAYMENT SCHEDULE

PLEA AGREEMENT

7/27/2018: PLEA AGREEMENT

STATE'S NOTICE OF MULTIPLE DEFENDANT DISCOVERY RULE

7/23/2018: STATE'S NOTICE OF MULTIPLE DEFENDANT DISCOVERY RULE

NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

7/23/2018: NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

INFORMATION FILED

7/17/2018: INFORMATION FILED

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION

6/20/2018: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER TERMINATING DEFENDANTS PROBATION--GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S PRO SE MOTION TO TERMINATE PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $109.00 RECEIPT #2019020933

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2019009271

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2018123567

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $15.00 RECEIPT #2018114712

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $66.00 RECEIPT #2018106799

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $67.00 RECEIPT #2018093059

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $36.00 RECEIPT #2018082308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketEntry: RECORDED DOCUMENT RETURNED FROM RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • HearingEvent: ARRAIGNMENT; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: STATE MOVING FORWARD WITH NOTICE TO APPEAR DEFENDANT PLED NOT GUILTY FILLED OUT AFFIDAVIT OF INSOLVENCY PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED BY JUDGE YOU ARE TO GO TO THE PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE ON THE FIRST FLOOR BY 5PM TODAY TO MAKE AN APPOINTMENT WITH YOUR ATTORNEY CASE SET FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WITH A 3 WEEK TRIAL PERIOD BEGINNING 8/7/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 07/27/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS PUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - NOTICE TO APPEAR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 06/06/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 05/01/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 MM 001539

    Read MoreRead Less