This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 07:16:46 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ALCANTARA, JOSEPH ORLANDO

Case Summary

On 01/23/2018 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ALCANTARA, JOSEPH ORLANDO. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0298

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ALCANTARA, JOSEPH ORLANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

EDGE, ROBERT

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

8/24/2018: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

ADDRESS CHANGE

6/14/2018: ADDRESS CHANGE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

6/13/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

5/10/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT PLEA OF NOT GUILTY REQUEST FOR COPIES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

STATE'S NOTICE OF MULTIPLE DEFENDANT DISCOVERY RULE

5/8/2018: STATE'S NOTICE OF MULTIPLE DEFENDANT DISCOVERY RULE

NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

5/8/2018: NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT REQUEST FOR COPY OF INDICTMENT OR INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR TEN DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS

5/8/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT REQUEST FOR COPY OF INDICTMENT OR INFORMATION AND REQUEST FOR TEN DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS

NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

5/8/2018: NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW

5/3/2018: CERTIFICATION OF CONFLICT AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW

STATE'S NOTICE OF MULTIPLE DEFENDANT DISCOVERY RULE

4/24/2018: STATE'S NOTICE OF MULTIPLE DEFENDANT DISCOVERY RULE

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION

4/18/2018: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AND DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION

INFORMATION FILED

2/21/2018: INFORMATION FILED

SURETY BOND 562164893-3 POSTED $500.00

1/23/2018: SURETY BOND 562164893-3 POSTED $500.00

SURETY BOND 562164892-0 POSTED $500.00

1/23/2018: SURETY BOND 562164892-0 POSTED $500.00

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • HearingEvent: JURY TRIAL; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • ChargeCount: 1; Description: POSSESSION OF CANNABIS < 20 GRAMS (893.13 6B); Degree: F; Level: M; Disposition: NOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • ChargeCount: 2; Description: POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA (893.147 1); Degree: F; Level: M; Disposition: NOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketEntry: 1 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • HearingEvent: PRE-TRIAL; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Result: EVENT HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE SET FOR JURY TRIAL EVE D'LUGO PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: JURY TRIAL SET FOR 08/20/2018 AT 8:30 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 03/06/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT/SENTENCING RESET INFORMATION NOT FILED YET, RESET FOR ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND 562164893-3 POSTED $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SURETY BOND 562164892-0 POSTED $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: CRIMINAL CASE OPENED - BOOKING REPORT FILED $500 ORIGINAL BOND AMOUNT CT 1 $500 ORIGINAL BOND AMOUNT CT 2 ADVICE TO DEFENDANT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 02/20/2018 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/23/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 MM 000298

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketEntry: DATE OF ARREST

    Read MoreRead Less